skip to content

Sarin, Mehender Kumar

CPSO#: 28062

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
05 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2021