skip to content

Sargolzaei, Fatemeh

CPSO#: 93341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: 519-641-6712
Fax: 519-641-6189 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1355 Huron St, Unit 7
London ON  N5V 1R9
Canada
Phone: 519-659-6399
Fax: 519-659-9930
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. F. Sargolzaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Business Address:
7-1355 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 1R9
Phone Number: (519) 659-6399


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FATEMEH SARGOLZAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARGOLZAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012