skip to content

Sarfaraz, Mohammad Omair

CPSO#: 100849

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Francis Family Liver Clinic
Norman Urquhart Wing
13th floor (west elevator)
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4868
Fax: (416) 340-4380 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Jack Nathan Health Hamilton
675 Upper James St.
Hamilton ON  L9C2Z5
Canada
Phone: 9057684400
Fax: 9055750760
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Palermo Medical Centre
2525 Old Bronte Road #190
Oakville ON  L6M4J2
Canada
Phone: 2898370222
Fax: 2898371222
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAIR SARFARAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFARAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017