skip to content

Sardana, Vandit

CPSO#: 97937

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WINSTON PARK MEDICAL CENTRE
2315 BRISTOL CIRCLE, SUITE 104
OAKVILLE, ONTARIO L6H 6P8
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: 905-829-2827
Fax: 905-829-2831 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

955 Ribaut Rd
Beaufort Memorial Hospital
Beaufort SC  29902-5454
United States
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vandit Sardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sardana ( CPSO# 97937 )

Business Address:
Winston Park Medical Centre
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2827


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:31 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANDIT SARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018