skip to content

Sarbu, Claudia Luminita

CPSO#: 91348

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2720 Riverside Dr
Sir Charles Tupper Building
3rd Floor
Ottawa ON  K1A 0M2
Phone: 343-575-9319 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA LUMINITA SARBU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARBU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2015 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2021