Ward, Sarah Emily (CPSO#: 103196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 argyle ave apt 3
Ottawa ON  K2P1B3
Phone: (613)8516488
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. E. Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ward ( CPSO# 103196)

Business Address:
3 - 31 Argyle Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2P 1B3
Phone Number: (613) 851-6488

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH EMILY WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016