skip to content

Sapp, John Lewis

CPSO#: 92527

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2011