skip to content

Santos, Gilda Da Cunha

CPSO#: 85805

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fundacao Universidade Federal de Sergipe, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Scaranelo & Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011
Corporation Name: Dr. Gilda C. Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019