skip to content

Santone, David Joseph

CPSO#: 89321

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Steet
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-201-3584
Fax: 905-294-6074 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David J. Santone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Santone ( CPSO# 89321 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Business Address:
Unit 101A
72 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JOSEPH SANTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013