skip to content

Santiago, Marcia Helena Alves Maciel

CPSO#: 92242

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 8452571 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marcia Maciel Santiago Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Santiago ( CPSO# 92242 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:07 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARCIA HELENA ALVES MACIEL SANTIAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTIAGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
EL - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 09 Jul 2018
EL - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

McMaster University, 14 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 13 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2019