skip to content

Santana Gonzalez, Jose Orlando

CPSO#: 91981

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
38 King St W
Dundas ON  L9H 1T7 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:05 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSE ORLANDO SANTANA GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTANA GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 10 Aug 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2009 to 09 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2010 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2020