skip to content

Sant, Nadia Prema

CPSO#: 92630

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Division of Microbiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 72389 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective:20 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADIA PREMA SANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
EL - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013