skip to content

Sangster, John Forbes

CPSO#: 21383

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John F. Sangster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Byron Family Medical Centre 1228 Commissioners Road West London ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 23 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Mar 2017