skip to content

Sangha, Navjeet Singh

CPSO#: 100620

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catherines General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A4
Phone: 905-378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Greater Niagara General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Welland Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L2B 4W5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Chow & N. Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chow ( CPSO# 105921)
Dr. N. Sangha ( CPSO# 100620)

Business Address:
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone Number: (905) 984-3335

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L2B 4W5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAVJEET SINGH SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2018