skip to content

Sang, Richard Tsoi Mook

CPSO#: 26406

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Shouldice Hospital 7750 Bayview Ave Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017