Sando, Takashi (CPSO#: 92218)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tokyo Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 24 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011