Sandilands, Erin Leigh (CPSO#: 88742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Sandilands Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sandilands ( CPSO# 88742 )

Business Address:
Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN LEIGH SANDILANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDILANDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012