skip to content

Sandhu, Sharron Kaur

CPSO#: 85770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Rheumatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 480-4233 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Annamalai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Annamalai ( CPSO# 85750 )
Dr. S. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85770 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4850

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 568
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective:13 Sep 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 20 Nov 2006 to 19 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 20 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 12 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2021 Active
 Dr. SHARRON KAUR SANDHU may practise medicine independently in rheumatology.