skip to content

Sandhu, Rupinder Kaur

CPSO#: 85069

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 - 170 Silvercreek Pkwy N
Guelph ON  N1H 7P7
Phone: (519) 265-8882
Fax: (226) 486-0172 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rupinder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85069 )

Business Address:
170 Silvercreek Parkway North
Suite 2
Guelph ON  N1H 7P7
Phone Number: (519) 265-8882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUPINDER KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008