skip to content

Sandhu, Lakhbir

CPSO#: 84802

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3M 3G7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAKHBIR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018