skip to content

Sandhu, Kirandeep Kaur

CPSO#: 94553

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Dhillon, Kirandeep Kaur (used until: 02 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen West Medical and Walk In
400 Queen st. West
Brampton ON  L6X 1B3
Phone: (905) 988-9617 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kirandeep Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sandhu ( CPSO# 94553 )

Business Address:
400 Queen Street West
Brampton ON  L6X 1B3
Phone Number: (905) 796-5777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRANDEEP KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013