skip to content

Sandhu, Karen Angela Parveen

CPSO#: 85371

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Shokar, Karen Angela Parveen (used until: 11 Jan 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen A.P. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2021
Corporation Name: Karen A.P. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85371 )

Business Address:
33 Rayburn Meadows
East Garafraxa ON  L9W 7E7

Business Address:
1 Elizabeth St
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN ANGELA PARVEEN SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008