Sandhu, Janmeet (CPSO#: 99128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Sardar Patel Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-8404
Fax: (416) 244-0310
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janmeet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017


Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99127 )
Dr. J. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99128 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 244-8404

Business Address:
Suite 2A
15 Fandor Way
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Phone Number: (905) 970-1222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Janmeet Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family medicine.