Sandhu, Indermohan Singh (CPSO#: 96851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Sep 2011

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
PO Box 1800
8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Indermohan Singh Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sandhu ( CPSO# 96851 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
P.O. Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Hematology Effective: 22 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Indermohan  Singh  Sandhu  may  practice medicine independently in medical
            oncology and haematology, only.