skip to content

Sandhu, Indermohan Singh

CPSO#: 96851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
PO Box 1800
8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: 519-372-3940 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Indermohan Singh Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sandhu ( CPSO# 96851 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
P.O. Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Hematology Effective:22 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr.  Indermohan  Singh  Sandhu  may  practice medicine independently in medical
            oncology and haematology, only.