skip to content

Sandhu, Guninder Bir Singh

CPSO#: 99127

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jul 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Government Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-8404 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99128 )
Dr. G. Sandhu ( CPSO# 99127 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 244-8404

Business Address:
Suite 2A
15 Fandor Way
Brampton ON  L7A 4S2
Phone Number: (905) 970-1222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active
             Dr. Guninder Bir Singh Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.