skip to content

Sanders, Sheilagh Clare

CPSO#: 98294

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sheilagh Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sanders ( CPSO# 98294 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:03 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEILAGH CLARE SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018