skip to content

Sanci, Vito

CPSO#: 98246

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Medical Staff Office
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
CANADA
Phone: 705-526-1300
Fax: 705-527-4563 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

hopital Notre-Dame
1405 rue Edward
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: 1-705-362-4291
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vito Sanci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sanci ( CPSO# 98246 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Medical Staff Office
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Dec 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VITO SANCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 25 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2018