skip to content

Sanchez, Angelita Rodriguez

CPSO#: 85670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Fax: (705) 671-3031 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Angelita Sanchez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sanchez ( CPSO# 85670 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELITA RODRIGUEZ SANCHEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCHEZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009