skip to content

Samuel, Oded

CPSO#: 31175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136A
Box 105
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 745-4949
Fax: (416) 401-4488 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dufferin St. Clair Community Clinic
1680 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 658-6666
Fax: (416) 658-8106
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oded Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Samuel ( CPSO# 31175 )

Business Address:
136A - 1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Box 105
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 745-4949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ODED SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1979