skip to content

Samuel, Justin Varghese

CPSO#: 87931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2 - 1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone: 289-239-8216
Fax: 289-239-7746 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samuel ( CPSO# 87931 )

Business Address:
1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone Number: (289) 239-8216

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.  Justin  Varghese  Samuel  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.