skip to content

Samuel, George

CPSO#: 88075

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015