skip to content

Sampaio, Tatiana Zorub Assis Loreto

CPSO#: 94448

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ont
Department of Critical Care Med
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3670 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

875 Carling Ave
CMPA
PCS
Second Floor
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Canada
Phone: 18002656522
Fax: 18777631300
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Loreto Sampaio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sampaio ( CPSO# 92075 )
Dr. T. Sampaio ( CPSO# 94448 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Module X - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:07 Oct 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatric Critical Care Medicine Effective:07 Oct 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2010 to 03 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2020 Active
 Dr. TATIANA ZORUB ASSIS LORETO SAMPAIO may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric critical care.