skip to content

Samosh, Adam Isaac

CPSO#: 96262

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brock University, Harrison Hall
1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: 905 688 5550 Ext. 3243 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Martin Samosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2014
Corporation Name: Adam Samosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Westmount Family Physicians Westmount Shopping Centre Suite 254 185 Wonderland Road South London ON N6K 1M6
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM ISAAC SAMOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2019