skip to content

Samoraj, Krystyna Zofia

CPSO#: 96103

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samoraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Samoraj ( CPSO# 96103 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA ZOFIA SAMORAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMORAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016