skip to content

Samokhvalov, Andriy Valeriyovych

CPSO#: 92491

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
Suite MacKinnon 137
150 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519)-824-1010 Ext. 32748
Fax: 519-767-3583 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH
Suite T519
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 36921
Fax: 416-595-6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samokhvalov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samokhvalov ( CPSO# 92491 )

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Suite 137
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9

Business Address:
CAMH Addiction Medicine Services
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ukraine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDRIY VALERIYOVYCH SAMOKHVALOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMOKHVALOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 20 Jan 2010 to 13 Apr 2010
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 14 Apr 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2021