skip to content

Vaidyanathan, Sammy

CPSO#: 94400

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 wilson ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1723 kipling ave
Toronto ON  M9R 4E1
Canada
Phone: 416 244 8404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5283 rutherford rd 3
Toronto ON  L4H2T2
Canada
Phone: 905 264 8311
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidyanathan ( CPSO# 94400 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 4, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 5, 2018, Humber River Hospital (HRH) notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan has taken a voluntary one-year leave from his shifts and other duties at HRH, effective October 4, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Mar 2020

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Vaidyanathan’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Vaidyanathan engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including: (a) Between approximately 2011 and 2016, Dr. Vaidyanathan purported to provide care and/or treatment to himself, including while he was on shift in the emergency department at one or more hospitals, and billed OHIP for some or all of this care and/or treatment; (b)Between approximately 2011 and 2016, while Dr. Vaidyanathan was on shift in the emergency department, Dr. Vaidyanathan sought and obtained treatment from other health care providers when he should have been available to provide care to patients;(c) In approximately June 2015, while Dr. Vaidyanathan was on shift in the emergency department of Humber River Hospital, he made inappropriate use of a stretcher and/or a mobile computer in an acute patient care area in which patients were being treated; (d) In approximately September 2015, Dr. Vaidyanathan engaged in inappropriate and/or unprofessional communication with colleagues, staff and/or hospital administration at Humber River Hospital with respect to new laceration trays; (e) In approximately 2015 and/or 2016, Dr. Vaidyanathan engaged in inappropriate and/or unprofessional communication with a nurse at Humber River Hospital with whom he had had a personal relationship; and (f) Dr. Vaidyanathan failed to provide complete and/or accurate information to the College on his 2016 and 2017 Annual Renewal forms, and a 2017 Physician Practice Questionnaire. Also, Dr. Vaidyanathan failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is incompetent in his care and treatment of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): July 13, 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 Feb 2020 Active
             (1 of 3)
            As from March 25, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations  imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sammy
            Vaidyanathan in accordance with an undertaking adn consent given by
            Vaidyananthan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            -     Max 7 shifts per week (8 - 12 hours) 
            -     Maximum total 63 hrs. per week (including admin time) 
            -     Call at home shift 0800-0800 1 per week (no other shift scheduled while
                  on call); Will go into hospital as required during this shift 
            -     May do 1 double shift per week (max shifts total would still be 7
                  including this shift) 
            -     Must have four scheduled days off during a month, call shifts are
                  considered to be a day off


            (2 of 3)
            As from February 3, 2020, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Vaidyananthan has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. SAMMY VAIDYANATHAN
                                         ("Dr. Vaidyanathan")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A"; and
                  links to the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule
                  "B")
                  
                  "Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                  Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, with a link to the
                  current regulatory list attached hereto at Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, certificate of registration number 94400, am a
                  member of the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Number 1104860,
                  allegations that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
                  profession and/or am incompetent in my care and treatment of patients.

            (4)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, have read the Notice of Hearing dated October 1,
                  2019 and January 9, 2020, which sets out the allegations against me. I am
                  aware of the College's concern about protecting the public and I
                  understand the nature of the allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude
                  the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with
                  the Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.


            (8)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that this Undertaking applies to each of
                  my office-based (i.e. out-of-hospital) Practice Locations. For greater
                  certainty, this includes but is not limited to all family practices,
                  walk-in clinics, and cosmetics clinics at which I may practice.

            (9)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have also entered into an
                  Undertaking with the College dated July 31, 2019 related to my emergency
                  medicine practice, and that this Undertaking in lieu of an Order under
                  section 25.4 does not amend, modify or replace the Undertaking dated July
                  31, 2019.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (10)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (11)  Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, shall keep a weekly Log of all prescriptions
                        for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances, and Monitored Drugs,
                        in the form attached as set out in Schedule "D", which will include
                        at least the following information (the "Prescribing Log"):
                  
                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the Practice Location at which the patient was seen;
                        (iv)  the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              amount to be dispensed  (i.e. number of tablets) and
                              frequency;
                        (v)   the clinical indication;
                        (vi)  whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vii) Dr. Vaidyanathan's signature;
                        (viii)the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review; and
                        (ix)  the Clinical Supervisor's signature.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to submit the original Prescribing
                        Log to the College on a weekly basis. For greater certainty, to the
                        extent that I have not issued any new prescriptions for, or renewed
                        any existing prescriptions for, Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances, and Monitored Drugs in a given week, I am still
                        required to submit the original Prescribing Log to the College, on
                        which I shall indicate that I have not issued any new prescriptions
                        for, or renewed any existing prescriptions for, Narcotic Drugs,
                        Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                        Targeted Substances, and Monitored Drugs in that week.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to maintain my own copy of the
                        Prescribing Log at all times, and to make it available to the
                        College upon request.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions
                        I write for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                        Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances, and Monitored
                        Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart(s).
                  
            (12)  Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors")
                        ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

                        (i)   Meet with me at one of my Practice Locations, or another
                              location approved by the College, once every week. For
                              greater certainty, no meeting is required if I have not
                              issued any new prescriptions for, or renewed any existing
                              prescriptions for, Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances, and Monitored Drugs in a given week;
                        (ii)  At each meeting, review the charts of all patients, from each
                              of my office-based Practice Locations, to whom I have issued
                              new prescriptions for, or renewed existing prescriptions for,
                              Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances, and Monitored
                              Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review;
                        (iii) Sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the charts that
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed with
                              me;
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least after each
                              meeting, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time
            .
                  (f)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections
                        (12)(d) and/or (e) above, I will cease issuing new prescriptions,
                        and cease renewing prescriptions for, Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances, and Monitored Drugs in my office-based practice until
                        such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                        the College.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        prescribing as a result of section (12)(f) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of
                        Registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the public register.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                  limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
                  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (14)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                  with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (18)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (19)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (20)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any
                  Order of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has
                  directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions
                  on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect
                  immediately despite any appeal.

            (21)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (22)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (22)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Vaidyanathan is the subject of a referral to the
                              Discipline Committee into allegations of failure to meet the
                              standard of practice of the profession and incompetence in
                              his care and treatment of patients. As a result of the
                              referral:
                  
                              Dr. Vaidyanathan must practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (23)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS
                  and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information,
                  in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                  this Undertaking. 
                  
            (24)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                  consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                  respectively. 

            (25)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this 
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led
                  to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.


            (27)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking. 
                  
                  
            (3 of 3)
            As from July 31, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Vaidyanathan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. SAMMY VAIDYANATHAN
                                         ("Dr. Vaidyanathan")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, certificate of registration number 94400, am a
                  member of the College.  (3)I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the
                  College conducted investigations bearing File Numbers 1100624 and 1101073
                  (the "Investigations") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct
                  and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (iv)  Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed, and a log of all
                              patients whose assessments are subject to direct in-person
                              observation;
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month detailing the care and treatment observed, providing
                              feedback on my documentation and care as well as providing
                              feedback on areas for improvement, or more frequently if the
                              Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of
                              practice.
                  
            High-Level Supervision

                        (vii) I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that I shall engage in
                              Clinical Supervision at a high-level for a minimum period of
                              two (2) months, during which I will practice a minimum of
                              twenty (20) shifts ("High Level Supervision"). For greater
                              clarity, the period of High-Level Supervision shall not
                              terminate until I have worked a minimum of twenty (20)
                              shifts.
                  
                        (viii)I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake and acknowledge that during
                              High-Level Supervision:
                  
                              1.    The Clinical Supervisor shall review my assessment
                                    including history-taking and physical examinations,
                                    treatment, management of test results, discharge
                                    instructions and follow-up plan for each patient I
                                    treat in each shift, before the end of each shift.
                  
                              2.    The Clinical Supervisor shall perform direct
                                    observation of my in-person assessments of two (2)
                                    patients per shift.
                  
            Moderate-Level Supervision

                        (ix)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that following the period of
                              High-Level Supervision, and only upon recommendation by the
                              Clinical Supervisor and subject to the approval of the
                              College, the Clinical Supervision may be reduced to a
                              moderate level, for a minimum period of two (2) months
                              ("Moderate Level Supervision").
                  
                        (x)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake and acknowledge that during
                              Moderate-Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisors shall
                              meet with me once every two (2) weeks to review a minimum of
                              twenty (20) charts, with a minimum of five (5) charts from
                              each of my emergency medicine Practice Locations.
                  
            Low-Level Supervision

                        (xi)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that following the period of
                              Moderate-Level Supervision, and only upon recommendation by
                              the Clinical Supervisors and subject to the approval of the
                              College, the Clinical Supervision may be reduced to a low
                              level for a maximum of eight (8) months ("Low-Level
                              Supervision").
                  
                        (xii) I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake and acknowledge that during
                              Low-Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisors shall meet
                              with me once per month to review a minimum of twenty (20)
                              charts, with a minimum of five (5) charts from each of my
                              emergency medicine Practice Locations.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessor
                        dated November 8, 2018 and June 6, 2019, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   A review and written summary of:
                              1.    The College policy on Medical Records;
                              2.    The College policy on Test Results Management;
                              3.    The College policy on Professional Obligations and
                                    Human Rights; and
                              4.    Ontario's Routine Immunization Schedule;
                  
                        (ii)  CMPA e-learning modules:
                              1.    Documentation: Charting Medical Records; and
                              2.    Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping;
                  
                        (iii) The University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping course; and
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to provide proof to the College of
                        my successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to complete this requirement by
                        December 31, 2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by
                        that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the
                        College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location at which I practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any
                        Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
                        Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my 
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and
                        NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix
                        "D", respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              College investigations were conducted into whether Dr.
                              Vaidyanathan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in prescribing, the practice of emergency
                              medicine. As a result of the investigations:
                  
                              Dr. Vaidyanathan will practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Vaidyanathan will engage in professional education in
                              medical record-keeping, test results management, and
                              professional obligations and human rights.
                  
                              Dr. Vaidyanathan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to any person who requires this
                  information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led
                  to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Vaidyanathan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's 
                        undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 3, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr.Sammy Vaidyanathan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 3, 2020:

Dr. Vaidyanathan is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of failure to meet the standard of practice of the profession and incompetence in his care and treatment of patients. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Vaidyanathan must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: July 31, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sammy Vaidyanathan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 31, 2019:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Vaidyanathan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in prescribing, the practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Vaidyanathan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Vaidyanathan will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, test results management, and professional obligations and human rights.

Dr. Vaidyanathan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: February 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Sammy Vaidyanathan was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Care or control of a motor vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to Section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: December 21, 2018
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1200.