skip to content

Assad, Samir Roshdy Girgis

CPSO#: 82212

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vibrant Medical Square
Building E
Suite 204
2640 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 0H3
Phone: (905) 303-0307
Fax: (905) 303-0207 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samir R.G. Assad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 19 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Aug 2012

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis Assad’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Assad engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A, whose identity has been disclosed to Dr. Assad, including by hugging and/or kissing Patient A, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with Patient A, and/or making inappropriate comments to Patient A.
 
It is also alleged that Dr. Assad failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is incompetent in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed to Dr. Assad.
 
It is also alleged that Dr. Assad failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his billings.
 
It is further alleged that Dr. Assad engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration by failing to comply with an Undertaking he gave to the College.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2022-12-13

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 15 Aug 2012 Active
 
            As from August 15, 2012, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis
            Assad, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Assad has provided to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective immediately, Dr. Assad shall not practice massage therapy.
                  Furthermore, effective immediately, Dr. Assad shall not engage in any
                  professional encounters with female patients of any age, in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of
                  a female practice monitor, and unless the other requirements provided in
                  his Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                  Assad may not be alone with any female patient, during any professional
                  encounter.