skip to content

Fikry, Sameh Adly

CPSO#: 92534

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone: (519) 569-8500
Fax: (519) 569-8506 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sameh Fikry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Corporation Name: S. Fikry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fikry ( CPSO# 92534 )

Business Address:
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 569-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMEH ADLY FIKRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIKRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Nov 2019
Summary:

On November 11, 2019, on the basis of uncontested facts and a plea of no contest, the Discipline 
 Committee found that Dr. Sameh Adly Fikry (“Dr. Fikry”) committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that: he engaged in professional misconduct by engaging in conduct or an act or 
 omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
  
 Dr. Fikry is a family physician who received his certificate of registration in 2010. Throughout 
 the relevant time period, Dr. Fikry practised in the Kitchener-Waterloo area. Dr. Fikry has no 
 prior discipline history.  
  
 Patient A became a patient in Dr. Fikry’s family medicine practice in 2015. She was seen by Dr. 
Fikry on three occasions in 2015. The first occasion was for a routine “meet ‘n’ greet”. The 
second occasion was for a complete physical examination. The third occasion, ten days later, 
 related to Patient A’s respiratory difficulties.  
  
 At the third appointment, Patient A attended at Dr. Fikry’s office with complaints associated 
with asthma exacerbation. Patient A reported having been seen in the Emergency Department for 
treatment of her asthma six days prior, but her symptoms persisted. She also advised Dr. Fikry 
that she had called his office the previous Friday afternoon before going to the Emergency 
Department, but it was closed. Dr. Fikry asked Patient A to enter his cellphone number into her 
phone for Patient A to use in the event of a future emergency, noting that he occasionally saw 
patients after hours. Patient A did so.  
 
Dr. Fikry then took an appropriate medical history, Patient A’s shirt was lifted, and Dr. Fikry 
conducted a lung examination. Patient A was wearing a bra. At the end of the examination, 
Patient A’s shirt was put back down. Dr. Fikry prescribed a new medication to treat Patient A’s 
symptoms.  
 
At the end of the clinical encounter as Patient A was leaving Dr. Fikry’s examination room, Dr. 
Fikry said to the patient: “I have something to tell you, but please don’t slap my face for it. Your 
bra, it is very elegant.” Dr. Fikry made no other comments to Patient A, and she left his office.   
  
These comments caused Patient A great deal of distress. She did not wish to return to see Dr. 
Fikry and de-enrolled herself as his patient.  
  
 DISPOSITION 
  
 On November 11, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 

 -     The Registrar suspend Dr. Fikry’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
       months, to commence on November 19, 2019, at 12:01 a.m.;  
 -     Dr. Fikry attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; and 
-     Dr. Fikry pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370.00 within thirty (30) days of 
      the date of the Order.

Hearing Date(s): Motion: April 22-23, 2019 Hearing dates: October 21, 23 & 24, 2019, November 11, 2019