skip to content

Sam, Justina Joyce

CPSO#: 86675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 222-0660
Fax: (416) 222-9238 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

7155 Woodbine Ave. Suite 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

5734 Yonge St. Suite 300
Toronto ON  M2M4E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3585 Keele St. Unit 4
Toronto, ON
M3J3H5
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: (416) 398-2588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David M. Hsu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hsu ( CPSO# 82650 )
Dr. J. Sam ( CPSO# 86675 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660


Corporation Name: Justina J. Sam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hsu ( CPSO# 82650 )
Dr. J. Sam ( CPSO# 86675 )

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
4 - 3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
North Toronto Endoscopy
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTINA JOYCE SAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011