skip to content

Sam, Francis Bainyin

CPSO#: 28931

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga-Adangme-Krobo

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Francis Bainyin Sam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2013