Salz, Liad (CPSO#: 100175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Wilson Ave., suite # 303
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: 416-785-8412
Fax: 416-785-8324
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salz and Caryl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salz ( CPSO# 100175)
Dr. W. Caryl ( CPSO# 95770 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Elignton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Jan 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIAD SALZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2017