Salmikivi, Lance Albert (CPSO#: 100316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salmikivi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salmikivi ( CPSO# 100316)

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANCE ALBERT SALMIKIVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMIKIVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018