skip to content

Saliba, Jessica

CPSO#: 101179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Highway 20 East
Unit 7
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-0008 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Saliba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saliba ( CPSO# 101179)

Business Address:
20 Highway 20 East
Unit 7
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone Number: (905) 892-0008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA SALIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015