skip to content

Salehi, Leila

CPSO#: 87180

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Apr 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room S1.184
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Salehi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salehi ( CPSO# 87180 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Avenue East
Room S1.184
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Emergency Department
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:25 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEILA SALEHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010