skip to content

Saleh, Zahra

CPSO#: 94529

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre 90 Royal Landing Gate Kemptville, ON K0G 1J0
Date Received: 24 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2020