skip to content

Saleh, Philip

CPSO#: 101176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Assistive Technology Clinic
3560 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 784-3600 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2018