skip to content

Saleh, Maha Safey El-Din

CPSO#: 95148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maha Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saleh ( CPSO# 95148 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHA SAFEY EL-DIN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017