skip to content

Saleem, Mohammad

CPSO#: 85375

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Agnes Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 2E7
Phone: (519) 954-8574
Fax: (519) 954-8578 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Saleem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saleem ( CPSO# 85375 )

Business Address:
11 Agnes Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 2E7
Phone Number: (519) 954-8574

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:21 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2009