skip to content

Saleem, Asifa Khatoon

CPSO#: 85720

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9617
Fax: (905) 336-9638 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Asifa Khatoon Saleem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saleem ( CPSO# 85720 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9617

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASIFA KHATOON SALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009